Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Martinez, Federico E, Martinez, Mauricio, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Vasu Vijayraghavan, against Does 1 Through 20, Larsen, Robert, Valley Transmission And Auto Repair Inc,, Whittingslow, Edward, represented by Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Winston Keh presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 06, 2021 |
CategoryBusiness Tort/Unfair Business Practice Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Plaintiffs Federico E Martinez and Mauricio Martinez against Defendant Valley Transmission and Auto Repair Inc., Edward Whittingslow, and others. The complaint alleges multiple violations, including breach of contract, brea...
At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: February 09, 2024Reply Filed
Date: April 05, 2023Declaration re:
Date: November 20, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: September 28, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 12, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: January 30, 2024Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: November 17, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: November 20, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 12, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: April 12, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: August 31, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: April 12, 2023Amended Complaint Filed
Date: August 29, 2022Reply Filed
Date: January 22, 2024Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 12, 2023Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: January 22, 2024Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 17, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 30, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 25, 2022Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: November 20, 2023Declaration re:
Date: November 21, 2023Notice Sent re:
Date: January 10, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 22, 2024Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: August 24, 2023Amended Complaint Filed
Date: January 06, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 06, 2021Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: November 30, 2023Amended Complaint Filed
Date: June 05, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: August 31, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: November 23, 2022Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: April 12, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 22, 2024Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: January 10, 2022Reply Filed
Date: April 05, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Admission
Date: November 17, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: July 19, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 17, 2023Answer Filed
Date: July 19, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 06, 2021Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: January 22, 2024Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: November 20, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 21, 2023Reply Filed
Date: April 05, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: November 20, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: November 20, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 20, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: January 30, 2024Order Filed Re:
Date: April 12, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 30, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: January 30, 2024Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: November 20, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses
Date: January 30, 2024Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 13, 2024Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 22, 2024Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 29, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 30, 2023Reply Filed
Date: January 22, 2024Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 16, 2024Reply Filed
Date: November 23, 2022Notice Filed
Date: December 07, 2022Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: January 22, 2024Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 22, 2024Motion re:
Date: February 09, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 22, 2024Order Filed Re:
Date: January 30, 2024Reply Filed
Date: January 22, 2024Order Filed Re:
Date: January 30, 2024Reply Filed
Date: November 23, 2022Demurrer Filed
Date: September 28, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 21, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: July 11, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 21, 2022Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: November 17, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: February 09, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 20, 2023Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: November 17, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 21, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: January 30, 2024Complaint Filed
Date: December 06, 2021At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: May 19, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 14, 2022Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: January 22, 2024Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 20, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 20, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: November 20, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: January 30, 2024Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: November 20, 2023Motion to Strike
Date: February 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2024 |
Department V11 - Victorville
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
February 26, 2024 |
Department V11 - Victorville
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed def Valley Transmisissions and auto repair Inc.'s reply brief to plainitff Mauricio Martinez opp to the motion |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed PLA OPPO TO DEF MTN TO COMPEL MAURICIO MARTINEZ RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORY NUMBER ONE AND REQUEST FOR COUNTER SANCTIONS OF $1,750.00 |
|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
At-Issue Memorandum Filed DEF AT ISSUE MEMORANDUM |
|
January 30, 2024 |
Department V11 - Victorville
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: Def Motion to Compel Federico E. Martinez to Provide Further Responses to Form Interrogatories |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by 60.00 ck for motion |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: Def Motion to Compel Federico E. Martinez to Provide Further Responses to Special Interrogatories |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: Def Motion to Compel Mauricio Martinez to Provide Further Responses to Form Interrogatories set one |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.