Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
La Casa Development Llc, Sievers, Jeffrey, Sievers, Raechelle, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Tomassian, Inouye & Grigorian Llp, Tomassian, Throckmorton, Inouye & Grigorian Llp, against Does 1 To 100, Gurrola, Daniel R., Gurrola, Olga I., Kocaya Jr., Thomas John, Kocaya, Sharon Lee, (total of 7) See All represented by Ensberg Law Group, King, Rachel, Kutak Rock Llp, Shumaker Mallory, Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Jeffrey R Erickson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey R Erickson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 02, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed in the Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Bernardino. The plaintiffs are Jeffrey Sievers and Raechelle Sievers, who are members of LA CASA DEVELOPMENT LLC. The defendants named in the complaint are Kevin ...
Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: December 29, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: January 09, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: July 26, 2022Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed
Date: April 11, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Complaint
Date: February 07, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: February 01, 2023General Appearance Filed
Date: December 23, 2022Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: June 28, 2022Notice Sent re:
Date: December 02, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: December 02, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: December 02, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 02, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: January 24, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 25, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: January 28, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: March 25, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 25, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 25, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 25, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 25, 2022Amended Complaint Filed
Date: April 08, 2022Notice of Pendency of Action Filed
Date: April 08, 2022Amended Document Filed re:
Date: April 11, 2022Answer Filed
Date: April 15, 2022Answer Filed
Date: May 09, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 16, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 16, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 16, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 16, 2022Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: May 19, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: May 19, 2022Answer Filed
Date: May 19, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 15, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 18, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 19, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: July 20, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: July 20, 2022Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: July 25, 2022Summons Issued on
Date: October 11, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 16, 2022Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: December 23, 2022Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: March 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2023 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed With Prejudice, filed by plaintiffs, filed 4/11/23 |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Return to Court's Control | |
March 02, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent | |
February 27, 2023 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Complaint 1st Cross Complaint filed 05.19.22 |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant With prejudice; Request for dismissal as to defendant. Filed by defendant on 02/01/23 |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order filed Joint Stipulation for Court to Retain Jurisdiction to Enforce Settlement Agreement Pursuat to CCP 664.6 and Order Thereon |
|
December 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional) filed by Plaintiffs filed on 12/29/22 |
|
December 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Balance Paid on Case for first app fees 2x |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.