Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Hohl, Lakiesha, Hohl, Louis, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Quill & Arrow, Llp, against Does 1 To 10, General Motors Llc, represented by King & Spalding Llp, The Erskine Law Group Pc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Jeffrey R Erickson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJeffrey R Erickson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 30, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: June 28, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance Electronically Filed
Date: October 26, 2023Declaration re:
Date: July 21, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 22, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: May 22, 2023Memorandum Filed
Date: May 22, 2023Stipulation and Order Filed
Date: May 08, 2023Reply Filed
Date: July 28, 2023Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed
Date: June 01, 2023Notice Filed
Date: August 04, 2023Declaration re:
Date: May 22, 2023Declaration re:
Date: May 22, 2023Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Summary Adjudication
Date: May 22, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: November 30, 2021Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 21, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 28, 2022Answer Filed
Date: March 21, 2022Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: April 14, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: November 30, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: February 24, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: January 20, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 08, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: November 30, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: January 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 08, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
July 03, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
October 31, 2023 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance Electronically Filed | |
September 05, 2023 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
August 31, 2023 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
August 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of Continued Hearing on Motion for Summary Judgment, Trial Readiness Confernce and Trial Date filed by Defendant filed on 8/4/23 |
|
August 03, 2023 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
July 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Defendant reply for Motion for summary judgment |
|
July 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: of Luis A. Serrano |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.