Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Carson Kotinek, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Matern Law Group, against Bc Rentals Llc, Bc Traffic Specialist, Does 1-50, Infrastripe, Llc, represented by Vorys, Sater, Seymour And Pease Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Brian S McCarville presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian S McCarville Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 16, 2021 |
CategoryOther Employment Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Carson Kotinek, individually and on behalf of others similarly situated, against BC Traffic Specialist, BC Rentals, LLC, InfraStripe, LLC, and Does 1 through 50. The complaint alleges various violations, including failure t...
Notice Filed
Date: April 07, 2023Declaration re:
Date: August 24, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 28, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 12, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 07, 2022Answer Filed
Date: February 16, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: January 20, 2022Brief Filed
Date: October 12, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: November 16, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: January 05, 2022Notice Filed
Date: February 16, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: April 01, 2022Declaration re:
Date: July 20, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 19, 2022Motion to Stay
Date: July 20, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: January 20, 2022Reply Filed
Date: August 25, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: November 16, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 17, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: July 20, 2022Declaration re:
Date: August 19, 2022Brief Filed
Date: October 25, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: March 17, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: November 16, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: July 20, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: January 05, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 21, 2022Declaration re:
Date: August 25, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2023 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
September 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed plaintiffs status report |
|
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Comment: signed order fwd to signed orders bin in clerks office for processing |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Olivia Green in support of plaintiffs request for dismissal without hearing filed by plaintiff Carson Kotinek |
|
August 01, 2023 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
August 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Held Via Court Call | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed NOTICE OF RULING RE STATUS CONFERENCE |
|
April 03, 2023 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Held Via Court Call | |
January 04, 2023 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.