Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Doe, John, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Esner, Chang & Boyer, The Keane Law Firm, Pc, against County Of San Bernanrdino County Of Sheriff'S Department, County Of San Bernardino, County Of San Bernardino Human Services Department, Cox, Jeremie, Does 1 - 100, (total of 8) See All represented by Collins + Collins Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Jeffrey R Erickson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 08, 2021 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a first amended complaint filed in the Superior Court of the State of California, in and for the County of San Bernardino. The plaintiff, John Doe, is suing the County of San Bernardino, Hope Academy, Inc., Provenance, Jeremie Cox, ...
Stipulation and Order Filed
Date: April 13, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 12, 2023Notice Filed
Date: March 06, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: May 22, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 13, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: March 06, 2023Proof of Service
Date: April 21, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: April 21, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 14, 2022Affidavit of Prejudice filed pursuant to CCP170.6
Date: February 14, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: June 27, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: August 22, 2022Declaration re:
Date: December 06, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: April 07, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 03, 2023Reply Filed
Date: April 27, 2022Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: March 08, 2022Response Filed to:
Date: October 04, 2022Amended Complaint Filed
Date: February 24, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: November 08, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: January 26, 2022Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: February 23, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: December 27, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 21, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 10, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: March 03, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed
Date: June 27, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 26, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: November 08, 2021Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: January 20, 2022Motion re:
Date: August 22, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 23, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 28, 2022Declaration re:
Date: February 03, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: February 23, 2022Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: March 28, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 10, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: 2022-12-06T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: February 07, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: May 03, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 01, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 25, 2022Notice and Order Re: Affidavit of Prejudice CCP 170.6 filed
Date: March 03, 2022Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: February 23, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 10, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: December 27, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: October 10, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 10, 2022Reply Filed
Date: February 15, 2023Objection Filed
Date: February 03, 2023At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: February 08, 2023Amended Complaint Filed
Date: May 23, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: November 08, 2021Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: February 23, 2022Affidavit of Prejudice filed pursuant to CCP170.6
Date: February 28, 2022Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: March 08, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 22, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: January 26, 2022Stipulation and Order Filed
Date: April 13, 2023Notice Sent re:
Date: December 27, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 27, 2023 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
June 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Joint Stipulation and Protective Order - resubmitted and filed 5/22/23 |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed filed by plaintiff John Doe, filed 6/12/23 |
|
May 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order filed Joint stipulation and protective order |
|
May 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Government Exemption - Fees Waived pursuant to GC 6103.5 for Joint Stip/Protective Order |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed Modifying Order Entered on March 6, 2023, Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Deposition Testimony of, and for Sanctions Against Witness Jeremie Cox and Any Person Who Advised Him to Refuse to be Sworn or Testify at Deposition |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Filed Appointing Hon. Sherrh A. Ellsworth (Ret.) as Discovery Referee for Deposition of Jeremie Cox. |
|
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $40.00 check paid on 4/11/23 for stips (x2) |
|
April 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): attorney Goldstein is not representing parties on this case. returned via atty bin. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.