Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Fidelity National Title Insurance Company, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Fidelity National Law Group, against Does 1-100, Golden Rule Lending, Llc, Gonzales, Martin, Gonzalez, Martin, Montano, Cesar, (total of 5) See All represented by Olson Law Firm, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Donald Alvarez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald Alvarez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 22, 2021 |
CategoryFraud Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice Filed
Date: February 15, 2024Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: April 06, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 11, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: May 11, 2022Motion re:
Date: November 14, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: February 07, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 24, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: August 28, 2023Reply Filed Electronically
Date: February 15, 2024Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: December 08, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: February 08, 2024Complaint Filed
Date: October 22, 2021Amendment to Complaint Correcting Name Filed
Date: January 31, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: February 08, 2024Declaration of Good Faith Attempt to Meet & Confer
Date: June 07, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: December 27, 2023Notice Filed
Date: December 01, 2023Notice Filed
Date: December 22, 2023Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:
Date: May 25, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: April 06, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: February 07, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 22, 2021Proof of Service
Date: February 07, 2024Balance Due on Case
Date: November 16, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 22, 2021Motion re:
Date: December 27, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 23, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 08, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
February 22, 2024 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed TYPOGRAPHICAL ERROR MISLABELING THE EXHIBIT TO THE REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED BY PLAINTIFF IN SUPPORT OF ITS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA OF BUSINESS RECORDS FROM WELLS FARGO BANK |
|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply Filed Electronically | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Efile Rejection Envelope#14363704 Your eFiling submission is being returned for the following reasons: Defendant Chicago Title Insurance Company is not a party to the case. Please correct and resubmit. Should you have any question you may contact the clerk's office at 909-708-8678 Monday - Friday from 8am - 3pm |
|
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Declaration Filed (Declarations) | |
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed Trial Setting Conference Statement (Statements) |
|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Request for Judicial Notice Filed | |
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion filed Electronically PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT GOLDEN RULE LENDING, LLC'S MOTION TO QUASH SUBPOENA OF RECORDS TO WELLS FARGO BANK |
|
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Request for Judicial Notice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.