Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Manhole Adjusting Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lane & Mcgowan, Llp, against Does 1 To 35, Jazzar Construction Group, Inc., State Of California Department Of Transportation, The People Of The State Of California, United Fire & Casualty Company, (total of 5) See All represented by County Counsel, Feldman & Associates,Inc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michael A Sachs presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael A Sachs Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 20, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Manhole Adjusting Inc. (MAI) against Jazzar Construction Group, Inc., United Fire & Casualty Company (UNITED FIRE), State of California Department of Transportation (CALTRANS), and several unnamed defendants. MAI is a Calif...
Reply Filed
Date: June 05, 2023Declaration re:
Date: May 24, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 15, 2023Reply Filed
Date: June 02, 2023Points and Authorities Filed
Date: June 05, 2023Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: May 24, 2023Points and Authorities Filed
Date: June 02, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: April 25, 2023Declaration re:
Date: May 24, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: May 24, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 07, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: May 24, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: April 21, 2023Reply Filed
Date: April 12, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 24, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 10, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: October 20, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 20, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 20, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: December 03, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 03, 2021Answer Filed
Date: January 06, 2022Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: January 10, 2022Answer Filed
Date: January 24, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: April 25, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 18, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 24, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: June 03, 2022At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: August 23, 2022At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: August 30, 2022Motion for Leave to File Cross-Complaint
Date: February 09, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 21, 2023Reply Filed
Date: February 27, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: March 06, 2023Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: March 06, 2023Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: March 10, 2023Declaration re:
Date: March 10, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: March 10, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: March 10, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 17, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: March 23, 2023Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: June 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
March 21, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
September 11, 2023 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
September 07, 2023 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling Filed | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed | |
June 08, 2023 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed DEF JAZZAR CONSTRUCTION GROUP INC AND UNITED FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY'S REPLY TO MANHOLE ADJUSTING INC'S OPPOSING SEPARATE STMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS |
|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Points and Authorities Filed DEF JAZZAR CONSTRUCTION GROUP, INC. AND UNITED FIRE & CASUALTY COMPANY MEMO PA IN REPLY TO MSJ AND/OR ADJUDICATION |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed DEF X/COMPLAINANT REPLY TO MANHOLE ADJUSTING INC'S OPPOSING SEPARATE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED MATERIAL FACTS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.