Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Alvarez, Beatriz, Lamas, Yolanda, R., A., filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Kermani Llp, against Day-Lee Foods, Inc., Does 1-100, Parra, Humberto, represented by Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Janet M Frangie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 15, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by the law firm KERMANI LLP on behalf of plaintiffs Beatriz Alvarez, Yolanda Lamas, and A.R. (represented by her guardian ad litem Eugenia Alvarez) in the Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Bernardino. Th...
Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 17, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: April 24, 2023Reply Filed
Date: March 09, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: July 19, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: April 24, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: April 24, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: April 03, 2023Amended Complaint Filed
Date: August 04, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 12, 2023Reply Filed
Date: March 24, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: April 24, 2023Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 17, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: April 24, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: March 08, 2023Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 17, 2023Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 17, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 09, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: July 13, 2023Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 17, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: April 24, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: April 24, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: April 24, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 14, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 17, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Special Interrogatorie
Date: April 24, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 19, 2023Motion Filed Re:
Date: March 08, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 12, 2023Ex Parte Order Filed
Date: July 07, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 11, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: July 06, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 11, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 15, 2023Answer Filed
Date: January 18, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: April 03, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: April 05, 2023Trial Setting Order filed
Date: March 30, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 07, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 01, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 07, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 07, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 08, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 07, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 09, 2023Verdict(s) form filed.
Date: August 08, 2023Verdict(s) form filed.
Date: August 08, 2023Statement of Case Filed
Date: August 08, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 08, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 01, 2023Motion Filed
Date: August 07, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 09, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 08, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 09, 2023Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: August 09, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 08, 2023Exhibits List Filed
Date: August 08, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 07, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 07, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 08, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 01, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 20, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 08, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 01, 2023Proof of Service
Date: August 07, 2023Witness List Filed
Date: August 08, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: August 01, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 08, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 07, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: March 21, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: October 15, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 21, 2022Declaration re:
Date: April 06, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: October 11, 2022Notice
Date: June 29, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 12, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 24, 2022Application and Order for Guardian Ad Litem filed. GAL is:
Date: December 07, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: August 04, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 05, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 06, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 15, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 07, 2021Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: April 01, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 17, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: December 06, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 20, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: May 26, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 15, 2021Amended Complaint Filed
Date: June 01, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2023 |
Department S29 - SBJC
Judge: Frangie, Janet M |
||
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed to MIL's #1 and #3 |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed to MIL #6 & #7 |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed to MIL #8 |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Non Opposition To The Motion Filed to MIL's #2, #3, #5 and to Bifurcate |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed to MIL #3 re: People -v- Sanchez: by defendant's, Humberto Parra and Day-Lee Foods, Inc. |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Verdict(s) form filed. by defendant's, Humberto Parra and Day-Lee Foods, Inc. |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Verdict(s) form filed. [Proposed] |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Statement of Case Filed *JOINT* |
|
August 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed *JOINT* list of jury instructions |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.