Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Medina, Ernesto, Rodriguez, Porfirio, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Quill & Arrow, Llp, against Does 1 To 10, General Motors, Llc, represented by King & Spalding Llp, The Erskine Law Group Pc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Wilfred J Schneider, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilfred J Schneider, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 04, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by the law firm Quill & Arrow, LLP on behalf of plaintiffs Porfirio Rodriguez and Ernesto Medina. The case is being brought against General Motors LLC and unidentified defendants (referred to as "DOES 1 throug...
Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 30, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 30, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance Electronically Filed
Date: December 01, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 30, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 30, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 30, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 30, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 30, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: August 30, 2023Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: April 25, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: October 04, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: November 12, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 09, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 21, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 13, 2022Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: June 30, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 21, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 09, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: July 27, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: June 30, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: April 13, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: November 12, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 19, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: August 09, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: July 25, 2023Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: August 09, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: June 30, 2023Stipulation Filed re:
Date: April 25, 2023Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: August 21, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: November 18, 2021Reply Filed
Date: August 14, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 05, 2023Declaration re:
Date: July 27, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 07, 2023Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed
Date: May 31, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: August 16, 2022Declaration re:
Date: July 25, 2023Reply Filed
Date: August 02, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 04, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 16, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: May 03, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 04, 2021Answer Filed
Date: April 12, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: August 09, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 25, 2023Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: September 05, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 27, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance Electronically Filed | |
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Volume Begins on this Date Volume 3 includes documents filed between 08/02/23 to PRESENT |
|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
New Volume Made. Volume Includes Documents Filed Between Volume 2 includes documents filed between 07/25/23 and 07/27/23 |
|
September 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
New Volume Made. Volume Includes Documents Filed Between Volume 1 inlcudes documents filed between 10/04/21 and 07/25/23 |
|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Filed via personal service; re: notice of settlement |
|
September 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Comment: file to doc control for new vol |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Motion in Limine are returned as a notice of settlement was filed 9/5/23 |
|
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional) | |
September 05, 2023 |
Department S32 - SBJC
Judge: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr. |
||
August 31, 2023 |
Department S32 - SBJC
Judge: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.