Case Last Refreshed: 3 days ago
Miller, Benjamin, Neil Alan Miller And Zenaida G. Miller, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of Justin H King, against Carland, Jerry L., Does 1 Through 100, Florentina Roman, Santa Marbella, Matsushita Electric, Nissan North America, Inc, (total of 7) See All represented by Gates, Gonter, Guy, Proudfoot & Muench, Gates Gonter Guy Proudfoot & Muench Llp, Klein Thomas & Lee, Klein, Thomas, Lee & Fresard, Manning Gross + Massenburg Llp, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Michael A Sachs presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichael A Sachs Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a first amended complaint for personal injuries and damages. The plaintiffs in this case are Neil Alan Miller and Zenaida G. Miller, who are the conservators of Benjamin Miller. The defendants named in the complaint are Santa Marbel...
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: October 02, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: September 30, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: September 30, 2021Consent to Eltronic Serv and Ntc of Eltronic Serv Add Filed
Date: September 08, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 18, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: September 30, 2021Amended Complaint Filed
Date: January 24, 2022Application and Order for Guardian Ad Litem filed. GAL is:
Date: March 30, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 14, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: November 04, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: August 14, 2023At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: March 10, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 15, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: November 29, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 12, 2022Answer Filed
Date: August 05, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 31, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 03, 2022Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: January 06, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 14, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: May 03, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: July 19, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 03, 2022Application for Order Filed re:
Date: August 04, 2023Answer Filed
Date: August 24, 2022Answer Filed
Date: August 12, 2022Notice Filed
Date: August 07, 2023Statement of Damages Filed
Date: August 25, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 14, 2022Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: October 30, 2023Answer Filed
Date: September 08, 2022Answer Filed
Date: August 25, 2022Notice Filed
Date: September 21, 2023Answer Filed
Date: September 28, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: August 25, 2022Application for
Date: November 30, 2023Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: September 08, 2022Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: September 08, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 11, 2022Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: August 25, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: February 13, 2024Answer Filed
Date: September 28, 2022At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: March 08, 2023At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: October 17, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 14, 2023Answer Filed
Date: October 07, 2022Notice Filed
Date: September 29, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: September 08, 2022Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: January 26, 2024Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: May 05, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 17, 2022Notice Filed
Date: August 04, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: Granting application for good faith settlement |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event | Dismissal Filed as to Complaint | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant Request for Dismissal as to Roman and Carland ONLY |
|
December 06, 2023 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Application for Notice of Settlement and Application for Good Faith Settlement (Applications) |
|
October 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Non Opposition To The Motion Filed NNA's Non-Opp to Santa Marbelia Florentino Roman's Notice of Settlement and Application for Good Faith Settlement |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant Request for Dismissal as to Panasonic Corporation of North America ONLY |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of entry of order entered on 08/14/2023 |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: Granting Application for Determination of Good Faith Settlement as to Jerry Carland |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.