Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Harper, Richard, filed a(n) Complex Civil Unlimited case represented by Lauby, Mankin & Lauby Llp, Lauby Mankin & Lauby, Llp, against Does 1 Through 20, Hamner Towing, Inc., represented by Jackson Lewis Pc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with David Cohn presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Cohn Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 04, 2021 |
CategoryComplex Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Declaration re:
Date: June 20, 2023Tentative decisions
Date: March 15, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: February 14, 2023Order signed and Filed
Date: July 17, 2023Tentative decisions
Date: July 17, 2023Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement
Date: June 20, 2023Declaration re:
Date: June 20, 2023Declaration re:
Date: June 20, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: February 14, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 09, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: February 14, 2023Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement
Date: February 14, 2023Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: August 08, 2022Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 25, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: August 31, 2022Declaration re:
Date: June 20, 2023Order signed and filed.
Date: March 15, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: October 04, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: October 04, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: October 04, 2021Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: November 08, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: November 08, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: November 15, 2021Summons Issued on
Date: December 09, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: November 15, 2021Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: November 16, 2021Amended Complaint Filed
Date: December 06, 2021Answer Filed
Date: March 07, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 17, 2021Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 02, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 16, 2021Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: March 09, 2022Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 31, 2022Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 08, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order signed and Filed Granting Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement and Judgment |
|
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Tentative decisions Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement |
|
July 17, 2023 | Tentative Ruling | Granted. Final Approval of Class Action Settlements Settlement of a class action requires court approval. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.769.) The moving party must demonstrate that “the settlement is f... | |
July 13, 2023 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Morgan, Jessica |
||
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: of plaintiff Richard Harper ISO motion for final approval |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement | |
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: of Kristina Bui Carlson, ESQ., ISO motion for final approval |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: of Brian J. Mankin, ESQ. ISO motion for final approval |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: of Jarrod Salinas with respect to Notice and settlement administration |
|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by 60.00check paid on 6/20 for motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.