Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Galindo, Andres, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by B & D Law Group Aplc, against Corona Jimenez, Carlos E, Does 1 To 100, Urbina Corona, Michelle, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Khymberli S Apaloo presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 10, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: February 03, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: November 10, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: November 10, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: November 15, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: November 15, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk
Date: 2021-11-10T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 03, 2023 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent | |
February 03, 2023 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
December 13, 2022 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
August 15, 2022 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
May 16, 2022 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons Issued and Filed | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing Sent | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Waived for $457.80 waived for first appearance/fax filing/copies and postage |
|
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | Certificate of Assignment Received |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.