Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Patenaude & Felix, Patenaude & Felix, A.P.C., against Does 1-15, Orozco, Hilda, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Thomas S Garza presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: May 03, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: October 13, 2021Declaration re: Reqst for Court Judgment under CCP585D Filed
Date: May 08, 2023Motion to Set Aside
Date: January 22, 2024Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: January 22, 2024Notice Filed
Date: January 22, 2024Complaint Filed
Date: September 14, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 13, 2021Declaration in Support of Entry of Judg under CCP 1033 filed
Date: May 08, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 04, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 23, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: September 14, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: September 14, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 22, 2024Declaration re:
Date: January 22, 2024Proof of Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: October 17, 2022Judgment by Clerk filed
Date: May 08, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: May 08, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 10, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 30, 2024Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 29, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 16, 2024Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 18, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2024 |
Department S24 - SBJC
Judge: Cabrera, Carlos |
||
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Duplicate Motion to Set Aside: If this is an amended motion please specify AMENDED on the documents |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Amended Motion to vacate default is being returned for the following reason(s): White out has been used on the documents, please resubmit as we cannot accpet it with white out. |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by 60.00check paid on 1/24/2024 |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set Aside and Vacate Default Judgment |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed ISO Motion to set aside and vacate default and default judgment |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of Nonappearance at Plaintiff's Motion to set aside and vacate default and default judgment. |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Proof of Service Filed | |
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: of Nathalia A. Aguirre ISO Motion to set aside and vacate default and default judgment |
|
July 12, 2023 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.