Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Romero, Manuel Marcos, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Banafsheh Danesh & Javid Pc, Banafsheh Danesh & Javid, Pc, against Does 1-20, Heartland Express, Inc. Of Iowa, Kincaid, Joseph Richard, represented by Adelson Mclean Apc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with John M Pacheco presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 02, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Answer Filed
Date: April 26, 2023At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: July 12, 2023Case Management Conference
Date: July 13, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: November 17, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: February 10, 2023Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: January 26, 2023Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: January 26, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 25, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: January 25, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: September 02, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: September 02, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 07, 2021Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: March 29, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 30, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: September 02, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: October 07, 2021Declaration re:
Date: January 10, 2023Notice Filed
Date: October 13, 2022At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: November 01, 2022At-Issue Memorandum Electronically Filed
Date: January 22, 2024At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: August 18, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed
Date: April 05, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: May 03, 2022Answer Filed
Date: May 03, 2022Motion to Vacate
Date: January 26, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 05, 2022Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: May 03, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 10, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: August 30, 2022At-Issue Memorandum Electronically Filed
Date: January 03, 2024Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: April 24, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2024 |
Department S31 - SBJC
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
||
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
At-Issue Memorandum Electronically Filed At-Issue Memorandums Electronically filed |
|
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
At-Issue Memorandum Electronically Filed At-Issue Memorandum |
|
July 28, 2023 |
Department S31 - SBJC
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
||
July 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Filed by Plaintiff |
|
July 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
At-Issue Memorandum Filed filed by Defendant filed on 7/12/23 |
|
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer Filed | |
April 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $435.00 check paid for first appearance fees. |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed | |
March 23, 2023 |
Department S31 - SBJC
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.