Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Amco Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Law Office Of Anthony T. Schneider, Law Offices Of Schneider, Holtz & Hutchinson, against Does 1-50, Evergreen Construction Group, Inc., represented by Law Offices Of Karen M Johnson, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Brian S McCarville presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryOther Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a personal injury case filed by AMCO Insurance Company against Evergreen Construction Group, Inc., a California corporation. The jurisdiction of the case is a limited civil case, with the amount demanded not exceeding $10,000. The c...
Amended Cross Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 21, 2022Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: May 20, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 21, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 23, 2023Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: March 02, 2023Declaration in Support of Req for Default Judgment Filed
Date: March 15, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: June 02, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: July 15, 2022Answer Filed
Date: September 26, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: July 03, 2023Declaration re: Reqst for Court Judgment under CCP585D Filed
Date: March 15, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: June 30, 2022Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: September 26, 2022Req to Ent Default Alrdy Entered. Req Clk/Ct Jmt Filed
Date: March 15, 2022Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: August 30, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 15, 2023Answer Filed
Date: August 30, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 18, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: January 25, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 30, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: September 03, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: September 03, 2021Summons Issued on
Date: September 30, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed
Date: April 04, 2022Judgment by Court filed
Date: May 24, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: October 26, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: September 03, 2021Summons Issued on
Date: August 31, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 04, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 07, 2022Summons Issued and Filed
Date: October 04, 2021Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: March 15, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 20, 2022Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: December 06, 2021Summons Issued on
Date: December 21, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: October 04, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 04, 2023 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed | |
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed | |
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued on 2nd cross complaint |
|
August 31, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $435 check paid by defendant for first apperance feess |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Cross-Complaint Filed 2nd cross complaint filed by cross complainant on 08/30/23 |
|
August 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Answer Filed Answer of Jr Newlook Painting Incs to cross complainant evergreen construction group, Incs cross complaint |
|
July 06, 2023 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
July 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Held Via Court Call | |
July 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to: Filed by plaintiff in 1st Cross Complaint Evergreen Construction Group Inc served defendant in 1st Cross Complaint Jose Rodriguez on First Amended Cross Complaint filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.