Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Rivera, Fabian, filed a(n) Complex Civil Unlimited case represented by Lawyers For Justice Pc, against Does 1-100, Metro Rf Services, Inc., represented by Medina Mckelvey Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Tony Raphael presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTony Raphael Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 10, 2021 |
CategoryComplex Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 27, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Fabian Rivera, both individually and on behalf of other aggrieved employees, against Metro RF Services, Inc. The complaint is made pursuant to the California Private Attorneys General Act (PAGA) and alleges a violation of C...
Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 28, 2023Response Filed to:
Date: September 06, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 28, 2021Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: November 29, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: May 17, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: November 08, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 01, 2022Notice and Order Re: Affidavit of Prejudice CCP 170.6 filed
Date: October 28, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: September 15, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: July 08, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: July 15, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: August 10, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: August 11, 2022Notice Filed
Date: January 23, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: August 10, 2021Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 08, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 28, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: March 28, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: November 18, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: September 15, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 10, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: November 18, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: January 10, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: November 15, 2021Affidavit of Prejudice filed pursuant to CCP170.6
Date: October 22, 2021General Appearance Filed
Date: October 22, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: September 08, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: November 17, 2022Case Management Conference Electronically Filed
Date: March 20, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2024 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference Electronically Filed Joint Response to Order to Show Cause Regarding Dismissal (Comment) |
|
December 13, 2023 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Raphael, Tony |
||
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent | |
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed JOINT RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING DISMISSAL |
|
September 14, 2023 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Response Filed to: JOINT RESPONSE TO ORDER TO OSC RE: DISMISSAL |
|
May 22, 2023 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: NOTICE OF HEARING - On the Court's own motion the 5/22/23 further trial setting conference is vacated and matter is set for an OSC regarding dismissal for 9/14/23 at 8:30am in S33 - The Court is in receipt of the joint CMC statement filed by Counsel on 5/8/23. |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
On Court's Motion, Hearing Previously Set is Ordered Reset the 5/22/23 further trial setting conference is vacated and matter is set for an OSC regarding dismissal for 9/14/23 at 8:30am in S33 - The Court is in receipt of the joint CMC statement filed by Counsel on 5/8/23. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.