Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Ortiz, Adan, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Law Offices Of Richard S Jacinto, Aplc, against Csp Contractor'S Inc., Et Al, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Janet M Frangie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 03, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: August 03, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: August 19, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 19, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: December 01, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed
Date: February 04, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 17, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Notice
Date: May 16, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.