Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cmre Financial Services, Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Love, Calvin F, against Stephens, Shawn, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Ronald J Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald J Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 22, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections -Reduced Filing Fee Limited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a summons in a legal case filed by CMRE Financial Services, Inc. against Shawn Stephens, also known as Shawn Ray Stephens, and Doe 1 through Doe 10. The defendant is being sued, and the plaintiff is seeking a response within 30 days...
Stipulation Filed re:
Date: August 02, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 22, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 22, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 22, 2021Complaint Filed. (Limited Jurisdiction - Dec BP6322.1(c)(1))
Date: July 22, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: August 09, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: August 09, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 30, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 01, 2022Judgment by Court filed
Date: November 01, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 20, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.