Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Sanchez, Alma Garcia, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Khorshidi Law Firm, against Does 1 To 100, Inclusive, Ross Dress For Less, Inc., Ross Stores, Inc, represented by Collinson, Daehnke, Inlow & Greco, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Khymberli S Apaloo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKhymberli S Apaloo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 09, 2021 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 08, 2022Reply Filed
Date: February 01, 2022Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: January 06, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 07, 2022Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: April 29, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 18, 2022Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: November 13, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: July 21, 2021Motion re:
Date: October 27, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 07, 2022Motion to Continue Trial
Date: April 07, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: September 26, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 26, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: July 09, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 28, 2021Trial Setting Order filed
Date: November 02, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 09, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: March 29, 2022Notice of Continuance Filed
Date: January 20, 2022Answer Filed
Date: August 27, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: July 21, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: February 08, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: July 09, 2021Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: August 27, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: January 07, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion filed Electronically DEFENDANT, ROSS DRESS FOR LESS, INC.S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF, ALMA GARCIA SANCHEZS MOTION IN LIMIM |
|
November 13, 2023 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
November 09, 2023 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
November 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Trial Setting Order filed MSC and Trial Orders for Department S25 |
|
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed by plaintiff Alma Garcia Sanchez | |
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $150.00 check paid on jury fees |
|
June 26, 2023 | Hearing | Jury Trial Judicial Officer Garza, Thomas S Hearing Time 10:00 AM Comment Time Estimate: 7-9 days | |
June 26, 2023 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
June 26, 2023 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
June 22, 2023 | Hearing | Trial Readiness Conference Judicial Officer Garza, Thomas S Hearing Time 8:30 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.