Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
California Business Bureau Inc., filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Love, Calvin F, against Ross, Valerie, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Wilfred J Schneider, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 10, 2021 |
CategoryRenewal Of Judgment Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Memorandum of Costs After Judgment Filed
Date: May 10, 2021Copy of Original Judgment. Old case number:
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Application and Order for Renewal of Judgment Filed
Date: May 10, 2021Notice of Renewal of Judgment Issued. Copy Filed
Date: July 16, 2021Notice of Renewal of Judgment Returned and Filed
Date: August 03, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 03, 2021Motion for Order
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 01, 2021Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 10, 2021Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: September 29, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: September 29, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.