Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Donald And Tedi Anderson, Fritzsche, Deanna R, Fritzsche, Gary E, James & Mary Hackett, Kevin M Charnesky And Jerri G Charnesky, (total of 8) See All filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani Llp, Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, Llp, against California Department Of Alcoholic Beverage Control, County Of San Bernardino, Does 1-100, Hudson, Michael, San Bernardino County, (total of 7) See All represented by Alvaradosmith, Alvarado Smith, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Wilfred J Schneider, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilfred J Schneider, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 07, 2021 |
CategoryBusiness Tort/Unfair Business Practice Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJanuary 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: December 15, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 23, 2021Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 10, 2022Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: December 15, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 24, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 23, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 24, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 01, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: March 16, 2023Reply Filed
Date: March 20, 2023Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 08, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: December 06, 2021Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: December 08, 2021At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: April 29, 2022Hearing is Hereby Continued to:
Date: July 22, 2022Reply Filed
Date: March 17, 2023Reply Filed
Date: December 07, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: April 29, 2022Reply Filed
Date: December 01, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: December 08, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 16, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: May 16, 2022Motion to Stay
Date: January 26, 2023Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 10, 2022Answer Filed
Date: March 11, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 19, 2022Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: January 19, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: April 03, 2023Declaration re:
Date: August 25, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: November 02, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 25, 2021Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: November 04, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: October 20, 2021Demurrer Filed
Date: November 02, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 07, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: September 20, 2021Notice Filed
Date: November 03, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 07, 2021Notice of Entry of Dismissal and Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 18, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 09, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 23, 2021Dismissal Filed as to Cause of Action
Date: October 15, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: June 07, 2021Demurrer Filed
Date: September 20, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 20, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 03, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: October 27, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: October 27, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: June 23, 2021Demurrer Filed
Date: October 20, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: October 27, 2021Demurrer Filed
Date: August 20, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: August 20, 2021Declaration re:
Date: September 20, 2021Declaration re:
Date: October 20, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 26, 2021Notice Filed
Date: October 26, 2021Demurrer Filed
Date: October 27, 2021Amended Complaint Filed
Date: September 20, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: November 02, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: June 07, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.