Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Esposito, Laurent, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Dillon Miller & Ahuja, Llp, against Does 1 Through 10, My Car With Attitude, Llc, Revolon, Oliver, represented by Landover Law Corporation, Apc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Frangie, Janet presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 14, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 13, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Motion to Compel
Date: September 01, 2023Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Set for Hearing
Date: April 07, 2022Declaration in Support of Reply Filed Electronically
Date: December 27, 2023Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing Filed - Denied
Date: May 09, 2022Order Regarding Remote Appearance
Date: February 17, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: September 01, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: September 01, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: July 08, 2021Answer Filed
Date: August 27, 2021Denied Fee Waiver Notice
Date: May 09, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: November 21, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 18, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: August 24, 2022Order on Court Fee Waiver After Hearing Filed - Denied
Date: May 09, 2022Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: December 26, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 27, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: June 30, 2022Declaration in Support of Reply Filed Electronically
Date: November 30, 2023Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed
Date: January 04, 2024Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: July 29, 2021Notice
Date: May 15, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: February 15, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 24, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 21, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: June 30, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed
Date: December 09, 2021At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: June 27, 2022Report Filed
Date: May 05, 2022Motion re:
Date: October 24, 2023Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed
Date: February 14, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: December 07, 2021Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: February 14, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: March 17, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 30, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: May 04, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: June 21, 2021Notice Filed
Date: October 27, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 14, 2021Reply Filed Electronically
Date: November 30, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 21, 2022Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: September 01, 2023Reply to Motion re:
Date: August 15, 2022Motion re:
Date: June 30, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 09, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance Electronically Filed
Date: December 05, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: December 18, 2023Motion re:
Date: January 31, 2024Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: January 30, 2024Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: September 01, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: September 01, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: July 08, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: October 24, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: June 14, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: August 15, 2022Notice Sent re:
Date: June 14, 2021Order Regarding Remote Appearance
Date: May 05, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 12, 2022At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: October 10, 2022At-Issue Memorandum Electronically Filed
Date: October 25, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: January 30, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: December 27, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: December 26, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: December 07, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 25, 2022Answer Filed
Date: July 29, 2021Order Regarding Remote Appearance
Date: February 16, 2023At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: June 24, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: August 15, 2022Order signed and Filed
Date: October 21, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: September 01, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 07, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: January 25, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 21, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
March 14, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling Electronically Filed | |
February 13, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Efile Rejection #14221447 Your eFiling submission is being returned for the following reasons: There is no reservation for your motion to set aside and vacate the assessment of monetary sanctions. Your motion must be submitted within 5 court days. Please call to make a new reservation. Should you have any question you may contact the clerk's office at 909-708-8678 Monday - Friday from 8am - 3pm. |
|
February 01, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion re: Motion to Set aside and vacate the assesment of monetary sanctions in order filed dec 12, 26 |
|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed IDC STATEMENT; Defts statement of issues in dispute plt's Objection to deft's notice of deposition of Plaintiff |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion filed Electronically Opposition to Motion to Vacate Order |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Declaration of Christine Gracco ISO Opposition |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.