Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Fitzpatrick, Shawn, filed a(n) Complex Civil Unlimited case represented by Work Lawyers Pc, against Concord Foods, Inc., A California Corporation, Does 1 - 50, Inclusive, represented by Mundell Odlum & Haws, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with David Cohn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 23, 2021 |
CategoryComplex Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a representative action filed by Shawn Fitzpatrick on behalf of himself and other current and former employees. The complaint alleges multiple violations of the Private Attorneys' General Act, Labor Code §2698 et seq. The violations...
Declaration Filed
Date: December 22, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: June 07, 2021Notice Sent re:
Date: June 07, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 07, 2021Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: June 18, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: June 21, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 18, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: June 21, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: July 01, 2021General Appearance Filed
Date: September 03, 2021Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 15, 2021Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: December 14, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: May 05, 2022Motion re:
Date: May 05, 2022Tentative decisions
Date: June 03, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 09, 2022Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: May 25, 2022Amended Document Filed re:
Date: June 17, 2022Amended Document Filed re:
Date: June 17, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 17, 2022Tentative decisions
Date: July 22, 2022Order signed and Filed
Date: July 22, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 06, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.