Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Raul Saldana And Eric Saldana, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Kampf Schiavone & Associates, against Brett Clement, Do, Dignity Health, Dignity Health - St. Bernardine Medical Center, Does 4 To100, Omar Saleh, M.D., (total of 9) See All represented by Creason Tucker & Associates Llp, Kjar, Mckenna & Stockalper, Llp, Thompson & Colegate, Wood Smith Henning & Berman, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Khymberli S Apaloo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKhymberli S Apaloo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 02, 2021 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: June 15, 2022Answer Filed
Date: July 20, 2021Statement of Damages Filed
Date: October 17, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: July 20, 2021Notice Filed Re:
Date: July 12, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 23, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: July 12, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 20, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: October 18, 2022Notice Filed
Date: December 20, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: June 15, 2022Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: December 20, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 02, 2022Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: October 21, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 14, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 12, 2022Declaration re:
Date: December 27, 2021Declaration re:
Date: October 18, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 12, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 18, 2022Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: July 12, 2022Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: May 16, 2023Notice Filed
Date: December 20, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: December 19, 2022Objection Filed
Date: September 30, 2022Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: October 13, 2022Answer Filed
Date: December 19, 2022Answer Filed
Date: December 27, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: December 02, 2021Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: August 19, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 30, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 19, 2022Request Filed Re:
Date: December 19, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: October 28, 2022Summary Judgment Filed
Date: May 19, 2023At-Issue Memorandum Electronically Filed
Date: February 13, 2024Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 11, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: September 30, 2022Notice Filed
Date: September 30, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: September 30, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed
Date: February 13, 2024Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: September 30, 2022Proof of Service
Date: November 14, 2023Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: October 04, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 23, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 30, 2021Motion for Summary Judgment Filed
Date: July 12, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: October 19, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: December 12, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: December 27, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: May 19, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: November 22, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 09, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 10, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: December 02, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: June 02, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2022-06-15T00:00:00Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: June 30, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: September 30, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: December 11, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 16, 2024Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 09, 2021Answer Filed
Date: December 11, 2023At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: February 16, 2024Complaint Filed
Date: June 02, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: December 11, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 19, 2022Reply Filed
Date: October 07, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: June 02, 2021Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: December 11, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: June 09, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2022-09-30T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2024 |
Department S25 - SBJC
Judge: Apaloo, Khymberli S |
||
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed Sent to Dept S25 |
|
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
At-Issue Memorandum Filed Filed by def Kaur Banipal Simpledeep on 2/16/24 |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
At-Issue Memorandum Electronically Filed At-Issue Memorandums Electronically filed (Comment) |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conf Statement Electronically Filed Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Electronically filed (Statements) |
|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Answer Filed | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Re Trial Attorney |
|
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury Trial Filed | |
December 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $435 / $150 paid from e-file on 1/18/24 for answer / jury fee |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.