Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Goldman Sachs Bank Usa, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Zwicker & Associates Pc, against Does 1-10, Magana, Denise, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Ronald J Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald J Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000.01 - $25,000 Limited |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 20, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 20, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-05-20T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: May 20, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 01, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: 2021-07-01T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2021-07-19T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: July 23, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: 2021-09-15T00:00:00Order Filed Re:
Date: January 04, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Judgment Filed
Date: January 04, 2022Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Separate Statement Filed
Date: 2021-09-27T00:00:00Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: February 25, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.