Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Fenchem, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Law Offices Of Aijun Zhang, against Does 1-25, Sdc Nutrition, Inc., represented by Reed Smith Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Wilfred J Schneider, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilfred J Schneider, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 20, 2021 |
CategoryOther Contract Unlimited |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint concerns a legal case involving the purchase of goods. Plaintiff Fenchem, Inc. filed a complaint against Defendant SDC Nutrition, Inc., alleging breach of contract, breach of the implied covenant, negligent misrepresentation, and inten...
Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: August 31, 2023Declaration ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: November 15, 2023Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: October 31, 2023Stipulation and Order Filed
Date: November 03, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 25, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: April 19, 2023Notice Filed
Date: November 14, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: December 18, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: November 30, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: December 18, 2023Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint
Date: April 19, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 20, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 01, 2021Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: December 04, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: June 01, 2021Reply Filed Electronically
Date: November 21, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: March 29, 2022Reply Filed Electronically
Date: December 13, 2023Notice Filed
Date: December 28, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: October 31, 2023Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: March 29, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 27, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 20, 2021Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: November 21, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: July 24, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 31, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: October 31, 2023Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: May 18, 2023Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: November 15, 2023Declaration ISO Opposition Filed Electronically
Date: November 15, 2023Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 02, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 24, 2023Motion to Continue Trial
Date: December 18, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 17, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 31, 2023Answer Filed
Date: May 23, 2023Reply Filed
Date: August 24, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: May 20, 2021Reply Filed
Date: March 22, 2022Proof of Service
Date: October 31, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 31, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: October 31, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 17, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: April 19, 2023Declaration re:
Date: October 31, 2023Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: November 21, 2023Proof of Service
Date: October 31, 2023Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: December 18, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: May 03, 2023Motion to Compel Further Responses
Date: July 24, 2023Supplemental Declaration Filed
Date: December 13, 2023Answer Filed
Date: April 18, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 24, 2023Application to Appear as Counsel Pro Hac Vice Filed
Date: October 26, 2022Reply Filed Electronically
Date: January 23, 2024Demurrer Filed
Date: February 22, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 20, 2024 |
Department S32 - SBJC
Judge: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr. |
||
February 15, 2024 |
Department S32 - SBJC
Judge: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr. |
||
January 30, 2024 |
Department S32 - SBJC
Judge: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr. |
||
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
New Volume Made. Volume Includes Documents Filed Between VOlume 1: 05/20/21 - 10/31/23 |
|
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event |
Volume Begins on this Date Volume 2: 11/21/23 - Present |
|
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Electronically SDC NUTRITION, INC.S REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL DATE AND RELATED DATES (Comment) |
|
December 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice Filed (Notices) | |
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed Of Jarrad L. Wood in support of Defendant SDC Nutrition, Inc.'s motion to continue trial date and related dates |
|
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: copy of minute order and Court Ruling |
|
December 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Continue Trial and related dates Filed by Defendant SDC Nutrition, Inc. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.