Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Gurung, Alisha, filed a(n) Complex Civil Unlimited case represented by Aegis Law Firm, against Does 1 Through 20, Uniqlo California, Llc, Uniqlo Usa, Llc, represented by Littler Mendelson P.C., in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Joseph T Ortiz presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 10, 2021 |
CategoryComplex Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 10, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 10, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-05-10T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 26, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: 2021-06-02T00:00:00Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: June 02, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 30, 2021Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: 2021-08-11T00:00:00Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2021-08-20T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 20, 2021Answer Filed
Date: 2021-09-10T00:00:00Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: September 20, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 07, 2021Joint Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: 2022-02-09T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-02-17T00:00:00Order signed and Filed
Date: March 02, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Stipulation Filed re:
Date: 2022-06-30T00:00:00Order Filed Re:
Date: 2022-07-07T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2022-07-21T00:00:00Stipulation & Order filed
Date: 2022-08-31T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Order Filed Re:
Date: October 05, 2022Stipulation Filed re:
Date: 2022-10-03T00:00:00Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2022-10-06T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2022-10-25T00:00:00Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: November 02, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 15, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 28, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: January 10, 2023Motion re:
Date: January 10, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: January 10, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: January 10, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: January 10, 2023Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: January 10, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.