Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Gardea, Rory, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Downtown La Law Group, against Does 1-25, Morales, Brissa, Walmart Inc., Walmart, Inc, represented by Pettit Kohn Ingrassia Lutz & Dolin Pc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with David E Driscoll presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid E Driscoll Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 03, 2021 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedNovember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Rory Gardea against Walmart, Inc., Brissa Morales, and 25 unknown defendants. The complaint alleges negligence and premises liability. Rory Gardea is an adult resident of San Bernardino County, California. ...
Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: April 13, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: March 16, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: May 17, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: July 11, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: April 22, 2022Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: June 02, 2023Order signed and filed.
Date: June 15, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: October 02, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: October 02, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 02, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 02, 2023Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: October 02, 2023Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: October 02, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: June 16, 2023Proof of Service
Date: October 02, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: October 02, 2023Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 02, 2023Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: October 02, 2023Proof of Service
Date: October 02, 2023Motion to Compel
Date: October 02, 2023Declaration re:
Date: May 10, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: February 03, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 18, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 24, 2023Summons Issued and Filed
Date: June 02, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 18, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: February 04, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: December 15, 2021Answer Filed
Date: January 26, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 02, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: December 03, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 18, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: May 18, 2021Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: August 17, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: May 18, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 01, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 07, 2022Motion to be Relieved as Counsel
Date: May 10, 2023Notice of Re-Assignment
Date: April 11, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: December 03, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2024 |
Department S22 - SBJC
Judge: Driscoll, David E |
||
March 07, 2024 |
Department S22 - SBJC
Judge: Driscoll, David E |
||
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed ISO Motion to Compel Deposition of Rory Gardea filed by Defendant filed on 10/2/23 |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed ISO Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories filed by Defendant filed on 10/2/23 |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed of Rafael Garcia-Salgado ISO Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories filed by Defendant filed on 10/2/23 |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed of Rafael Garcia-Salgado ISO Motion to Compel Deposition of Rory Gardea filed by Defendant filed on 10/2/23 |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories filed by Defendant filed on 10/2/23 |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories filed by Defendant filed on 10/2/23 |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service as to Motion to Compel Deposition of Rory Gardea |
|
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Filed of Rafael Garcia-Salgado ISO Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories filed by Defendant filed on 10/2/23 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.