Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Rutherford, James, filed a(n) Civil Rights Unlimited case represented by Manning Law Apc, Manning Law, Apc, against Does 1-10, Vasquez, Miguel, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Wilfred J Schneider, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 10, 2021 |
CategoryCivil Rights Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a verified complaint filed by James Rutherford against Miguel Vasquez and Does 1-10 in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The complaint alleges violations of the Unruh Civil Rights Act, California Civil Code...
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 10, 2021Notice Filed
Date: June 29, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 22, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 10, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: July 13, 2021Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 08, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: November 23, 2021Req to Ent Default Alrdy Entered. Req Clk/Ct Jmt Filed
Date: June 14, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: June 14, 2022Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: August 17, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: May 22, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 05, 2021Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: November 12, 2021Notice Filed
Date: March 18, 2022Declaration re: Reqst for Court Judgment under CCP585D Filed
Date: June 14, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: June 16, 2022Summary of Case/Case Summary
Date: June 14, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 17, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: May 10, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 07, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 18, 2022Motion to Vacate Entry of Default and Default Judgment
Date: October 02, 2023Summary of Case/Case Summary
Date: July 07, 2023Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: February 17, 2023Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: December 27, 2023Response Filed to:
Date: February 10, 2023Signed Judgment Filed With Court
Date: July 14, 2023Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: July 07, 2023Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted
Date: October 06, 2023Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 25, 2024Declaration in Support of Judgment
Date: July 07, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: February 10, 2023Motion to Vacate Default Judgment
Date: February 16, 2024Declaration Pursuant to CCP585(d) Filed
Date: July 07, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2024 |
Department S32 - SBJC
Judge: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr. |
||
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Waived for Mtn to vacate default fees waived |
|
February 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion to Vacate Default Judgment Def Miguel Vasquez motion to vacate default |
|
February 09, 2024 |
Department S32 - SBJC
Judge: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr. |
||
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference Statement Filed | |
December 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Request to Enter Default Filed DEFENDANT HAD 30 DAYS FROM 11/16/23 TO FILE ANSWER |
|
November 16, 2023 |
Department S32 - SBJC
Judge: Schneider, Wilfred J, Jr. |
||
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Set Aside Entire Judgment Judgment signed on 7/14/23 was improper as Default hearing was required and the attachment to the judgment enjoining an unnamed defendant is improper. |
|
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Return to Court's Control | |
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Court orders Default Set Aside as to Miguel Vasquez |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.