Case Last Refreshed: 1 hour ago
Meyndert, Matthew, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by The Law Offices Of Fang Chen, against Cnc Motors Inc, Does 1 Through 20, Lotus Of Upland, Llc, Thom, Clayton, represented by Larson Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Donald Alvarez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDonald Alvarez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 06, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed by Matthew Meyndert against CNC Motors, Inc. and Lotus of Upland, LLC. The complaint alleges several causes of action, including breach of contract, breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealin...
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 06, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: May 06, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 20, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: May 20, 2021Motion re:
Date: July 20, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: July 20, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 16, 2021Answer Filed
Date: August 09, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: September 01, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 16, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 16, 2021Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: July 07, 2022Proof of service by Mail and Ack of receipt of service
Date: June 21, 2022Proof of service by Mail and Ack of receipt of service
Date: June 21, 2022Proof of service by Mail and Ack of receipt of service
Date: June 21, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 11, 2023Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 16, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: 4/9/24 min order |
|
April 09, 2024 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
October 16, 2023 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
August 25, 2023 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: 04/11/23 Minute Order |
|
April 11, 2023 |
Department S28 - SBJC
Judge: Sachs, Michael A |
||
March 28, 2023 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
November 04, 2022 |
Department S23 - SBJC
Judge: Alvarez, Donald |
||
July 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Ruling Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.