Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
James, Lynnee, Williams, Lashawn, filed a(n) Complex Civil Unlimited case represented by Capstone Law Apc, against Does 1 Through 10, Rainbow Usa Inc., represented by Seyfarth Shaw Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with David Cohn presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 06, 2021 |
CategoryComplex Civil Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a PAGA enforcement action filed by LaShawn Williams and Lynnee James, on behalf of themselves and other aggrieved employees, against Rainbow USA Inc. The complaint alleges violations of the California Labor Code and seeks civil pena...
Notice Filed
Date: April 04, 2022Notice Filed
Date: June 15, 2022Notice Filed
Date: July 15, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: May 18, 2022Notice Filed
Date: September 07, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 06, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 06, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 20, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: May 20, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: May 28, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: May 28, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 03, 2021Notice Filed
Date: August 06, 2021Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 06, 2021Notice Filed
Date: August 06, 2021Answer Filed
Date: September 10, 2021Notice Filed
Date: August 11, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 25, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Opposition is rejected because plaintiffs motion to compel arbitration has not yet been filed with the courts. Motion must be filed in order to oppose motion |
|
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Order assigning coordination trial judge. |
|
August 08, 2022 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Cohn, David |
||
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Court Orders Matter Stayed | |
July 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Order Granting Petition for Coordination |
|
June 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of Order Assigning Coordination Judge and Hearing on Petition for Coordination |
|
June 15, 2022 |
Department S26 - SBJC
Judge: Cohn, David |
||
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: Assigning Coordination Motion Judge - RE: coordination of Rainbow USA Wage and Hour Cases |
|
April 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of Submission of Petition for Coordination |
|
February 15, 2022 | Hearing | Further Case Management Conference Judicial Officer Cohn, David Hearing Time 9:00 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.