Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Capital One Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Hunt & Henriques, against Corey, Keisha Thompson, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Jay H Robinson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 06, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 06, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-05-06T00:00:00Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 06, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 19, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: May 19, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 04, 2021Answer Filed
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: 2021-06-29T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: 2021-07-02T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Memorandum of Costs
Date: August 23, 2021Motion re:
Date: 2021-08-23T00:00:00Stipulation Filed re:
Date: 2021-10-08T00:00:00Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 24, 2022Notice Filed
Date: November 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 19, 2022 | Hearing | OSC Re: Status of Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 Judicial Officer Robinson, Jay H Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated | |
May 19, 2022 |
Department S16 - SBJC
Judge: Robinson, Jay H |
||
March 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Notice of Settlement of Entire Case, Request For Dismissal - Case was dismissed on 11/10/2021. |
|
November 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice Of Entry Of Order |
|
November 10, 2021 | Hearing | Predisposition Motion re: Judicial Officer Robinson, Jay H Hearing Time 9:00 AM Cancel Reason Vacated | |
November 10, 2021 | Hearing | Further Trial Setting Conference View Document **CV - Portal Minute Order View Document Further Trial Setting Conference Judicial Officer Robinson, Jay H Hearing Time 9:00 AM Result Held | |
November 10, 2021 |
Department S16 - SBJC
Judge: Robinson, Jay H |
||
October 13, 2021 | Hearing | Filing Fee Paid by Comment 60$ motion fee | |
October 13, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by 60$ motion fee |
|
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $20.00 paid by Plaintiff - Check # 233882 - Stipulation Agreement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.