Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Al-Asfour, Nassar, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by The Law Office Of Gregory T Annigian, The Law Offices Of Gregory T. Annigian, against Does 1-10, Island Auto Parts Warehouse, Inc., Zadeh, Abdul G, represented by Ziprick & Associates Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with John M Pacheco presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 26, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint concerns a declaration of title to real property and the recovery of lost profits from a business. The plaintiff, Nassar Al-Asfour, filed a complaint against defendants Abdul G. Zadeh and Island Auto Parts Warehouse. The second amended...
Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests Prod of Docs
Date: April 03, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 13, 2023Amended Document Filed re:
Date: June 14, 2023Reply Filed
Date: June 22, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: March 23, 2023Reply Filed
Date: June 22, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: June 13, 2023Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: April 06, 2023Amended Cross Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 21, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: April 03, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 19, 2023Declaration re:
Date: March 29, 2022Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: April 18, 2022Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 27, 2021Reply Filed
Date: January 11, 2023Answer Filed
Date: April 18, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 26, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: January 11, 2023Demurrer Filed
Date: November 16, 2022Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: April 28, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 11, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 14, 2022Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 26, 2021Reply Filed
Date: March 22, 2022Demurrer Filed
Date: July 02, 2021Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 29, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 20, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: April 28, 2022Declaration re:
Date: March 22, 2022Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: January 20, 2023Declaration Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 27, 2021Amended Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: October 17, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 13, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 15, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: November 03, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 10, 2021Demurrer Filed
Date: September 07, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: March 14, 2022Declaration re:
Date: July 02, 2021Notice Filed
Date: August 11, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: October 15, 2021Amended Complaint and Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 29, 2021Motion to Strike
Date: September 07, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 29, 2021Demurrer Filed
Date: January 11, 2022Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: November 03, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: March 29, 2022Declaration Filed
Date: January 11, 2022Ruling on Submitted Matter
Date: March 29, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 02, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: May 20, 2021Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: July 07, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 05, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: April 26, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2023 |
Department S31 - SBJC
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
||
August 25, 2023 | Department S34 - SBJC | ||
June 29, 2023 |
Department S31 - SBJC
Judge: Pacheco, John M |
||
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed in support of Motion to compel further responses and production to first set of request for production from Defendants filed by Plaintiff Nassar Al-Asfour |
|
June 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed in support of Demurrer to second Amended Cross-Complaint field by Plaintiff Nassar Al-Asfour |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Amended Document Filed re: Amended Proof of Service to Opposition to Demurrer To Second-Amended Verified Cross-Complaint |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $4.35 paid 06/21/23 fax, copies, postage |
|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Fax Received Amended POS to Oppo to Demurrer |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed to motion to compel futher responses and production to first set of Requests for production from Defendant's Filed by All Defendants/Cross Defendants |
|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion Filed to Demurrer to Second-amended Verified Cross Complaint Filed by All Defendants/Cross Defendants |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.