Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) Forfeiture - Criminal case represented by District Attorney - Jason Anderson, against $17,480.00 U.S. Currency, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Brian S McCarville presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 28, 2021 |
CategoryAsset Forfeiture Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeForfeiture |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a civil action for the forfeiture of $17,480.00 U.S. Currency under Health and Safety Code section 1488.4. The court has jurisdiction over this matter under Health and Safety Code section 11488.4(a). The defendant property, located ...
Declaration in Support of Req for Default Judgment Filed
Date: February 03, 2023Declaration in Support of Req for Default Judgment Filed
Date: February 03, 2023Rqst for Entry of Dflt and Rqst for Clerk's/Court Jmt Filed
Date: February 03, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 28, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: April 28, 2021Petition for Forfeiture
Date: April 28, 2021Notice Sent re:
Date: May 11, 2021Proof of Publication Filed as to
Date: August 10, 2021Judgment by Court filed
Date: February 03, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: February 03, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2023 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Req for Default Judgment Filed Rebeca Hynds |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration in Support of Req for Default Judgment Filed Joseph Maltese |
|
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Rqst for Entry of Dflt and Rqst for Clerk's/Court Jmt Filed | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment by Court filed | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: for distribution |
|
November 30, 2022 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
September 01, 2022 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
July 15, 2022 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
April 06, 2022 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.