Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Flores, Tanisha, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Ivie Mcneill Wyatt Purcell & Diggs, against Does 1 To 20, Santos Johnson, Refugio, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with John M Pacheco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn M Pacheco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 12, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint document is a proof of service of summons in a legal case. The plaintiff, Tanisha Flores, is represented by attorney Rickey Ivie. The defendant/respondent is Refugio Santos Johnson. The document indicates that the plaintiff served copi...
Objection Filed
Date: July 03, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: November 30, 2023Answer Filed
Date: October 18, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: November 30, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 12, 2021Exhibit List Filed Electronically
Date: November 29, 2023Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 12, 2021Memorandum of Costs
Date: January 11, 2024Motion in Limine re:
Date: November 30, 2023Motion to Compel Responses to Requests for Production of Doc
Date: March 28, 2023Memorandum of Costs
Date: January 26, 2024Special Verdict filed.
Date: December 19, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: October 18, 2021Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: October 18, 2021Stipulation & Order filed
Date: September 14, 2023Notice Filed
Date: April 25, 2023Motion re:
Date: January 26, 2024Witness List Filed Electronically
Date: November 29, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: November 30, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 11, 2022Motion in Limine re:
Date: November 30, 2023Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: March 28, 2023Opposition to Motion in Limine Filed Electronically
Date: November 29, 2023Motion to Compel Responses to Special Interrogatories
Date: May 25, 2022Motion to Compel Requests for Admissions
Date: May 25, 2022Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: March 28, 2023Instructions to the jury-given-filed
Date: December 19, 2023Complaint Filed
Date: April 12, 2021Instructions to the jury-given-filed
Date: December 11, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 30, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: May 07, 2021Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: November 02, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed
Date: November 08, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: November 08, 2021Stip re: jury Instructions/Verdict/Stay/Dispo Material filed
Date: December 11, 2023Jury Fees Posted
Date: December 19, 2023Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories
Date: May 25, 2022Opposition to Motion filed Electronically
Date: February 27, 2024Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 07, 2021Statement of Case Filed Electronically
Date: November 29, 2023Stipulation Filed re:
Date: December 13, 2023Trial Brief Filed Electronically
Date: November 29, 2023Motion in Limine re:
Date: November 30, 2023Judgment after Jury Trial Filed
Date: February 05, 2024Reply Filed Electronically
Date: March 05, 2024Stip and appointment of pro tem reporter filed
Date: December 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2024 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply Filed Electronically REPLY TO DEFENDANT S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO TAX COSTS |
|
February 27, 2024 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion filed Electronically OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF S MOTION TO TAX DEFENDANT S MEMORANDUM OF COSTS; DECLARATION OF MARK P. LASCOLA IN SUPPORT |
|
February 09, 2024 |
Department S17 - SBJC
Judge: Ortiz, Joseph T |
||
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Efile Rejection #13797573 Deposition Transcript Excerpts. judgment Entered 02/05/24 |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Judgment after Jury Trial Filed on Special Verdict |
|
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs | |
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion re: Plaintiff Tanisha Flores Motion to tax costs sought by defendant. |
|
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Efile Rejection Envelope # 14183715. Your eFiling submission is being returned for the following reasons: Rejected per Francine. resubmit with new motion date. Please correct and resubmit. Should you have any question you may contact the clerk's office at 909-708-8678 Monday - Friday from 8am - 3pm |
|
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $60 cc paid on 2/5/24 for mtn to tax costs on efile |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.