Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
State Farm General Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Watkins & Letofsky, Llp, against Air Vent Inc., Does 1-20, represented by Wood Smith Henning & Berman, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Frangie, Janet presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2021 |
CategoryOther Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by State Farm General Insurance Company against Air Vent Inc. and Does 1-20. State Farm General Insurance Company alleges negligence and strict products liability on the part of the defendants. State Farm General Insurance Com...
Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: February 10, 2023Cross-Complaint Filed
Date: March 09, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: June 01, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 09, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 10, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: April 19, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: April 11, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: February 17, 2023Declaration re:
Date: March 19, 2024Summons Issued on
Date: July 26, 2022Declaration re:
Date: June 20, 2023Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: August 15, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: April 19, 2021Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: November 30, 2023Notice of Continuance Filed
Date: June 08, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance Electronically Filed
Date: October 24, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: March 19, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 19, 2021Answer Filed
Date: August 30, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 25, 2022Motion re:
Date: January 19, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: June 22, 2023Answer Filed
Date: March 06, 2023Motion re:
Date: August 09, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: March 08, 2022Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: June 22, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: March 21, 2024Notice Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 10, 2021Motion re:
Date: March 19, 2024Declaration Filed
Date: January 29, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 23, 2022Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: March 01, 2022Motion to Quash Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: January 29, 2024Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: September 21, 2022Order signed and Filed
Date: September 21, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: March 21, 2024Ex Parte Application
Date: March 20, 2024Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 19, 2021Order signed and filed.
Date: March 07, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed
Date: November 01, 2021Notice Filed
Date: July 20, 2022Non Opposition To The Motion Filed
Date: September 14, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: April 13, 2023Declaration re:
Date: August 08, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: August 12, 2022Case Management Conference Electronically Filed
Date: October 02, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 21, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: August 30, 2021Notice of Remote Appearance Electronically Filed
Date: October 02, 2023Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: April 13, 2023Order Regarding Remote Appearance
Date: June 27, 2023Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: March 22, 2024Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: March 19, 2024Motion re:
Date: 2022-08-09T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
April 03, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Ruling Filed exparte order for shortening time |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Minute Order |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Filed Re: granting ex parte for order shortening time to hear motion |
|
March 21, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Tanada, Stephanie |
||
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application for an order shortening time for deft's Motion to file confidential Decl. of Courtney Jakofsky and Brad Holland |
|
March 20, 2024 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $60 ck paid for exparte |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: Cameron Jackson IOS Air Vent, Inc's Oppo |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: NOTICE OF HEARING - On the Court's own motion the 3/27/24 further trial setting conference is continued to 4/2/24 at 8:30am in S33 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.