Case Last Refreshed: 3 hours ago
Chapman, Linda A, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Burt, Steven W, against Does 1-100, Dr. Faith Lee-Jackson, Lee-Jackson M.D., Faith, represented by Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Jay H Robinson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJay H Robinson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 03, 2021 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice Unlimited |
Last RefreshedApril 27, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal case filed by Linda A. Chapman against Dr. Faith Lee-Jackson and other defendants. The case is assigned to Hon. Brian S. McCarville in the Superior Court of San Bernardino County, California. The case number is CIVSB2110756....
Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: March 08, 2022Answer Filed
Date: March 08, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 11, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: July 11, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: August 18, 2022Notice Filed
Date: August 10, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: April 11, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 18, 2022Motion re:
Date: August 25, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: October 05, 2022Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: October 31, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: October 05, 2022Declaration re:
Date: October 31, 2022Declaration re:
Date: October 31, 2022Notice Filed
Date: October 31, 2022Declaration re:
Date: October 31, 2022Separate Statement Filed
Date: October 31, 2022Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: October 31, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: November 21, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 04, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 05, 2023Declaration re:
Date: January 05, 2023Declaration re:
Date: January 05, 2023Declaration re:
Date: January 05, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: January 05, 2023Declaration re:
Date: January 09, 2023Ex Parte Application
Date: January 09, 2023Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: January 09, 2023Reply Filed
Date: January 17, 2023Notice of Re-Assignment
Date: January 26, 2023Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: January 17, 2023Evidentiary Objections Filed
Date: January 20, 2023Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: April 03, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: February 03, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: July 27, 2023Stipulation & Order filed
Date: April 03, 2023Motion for Terminating Sanctions
Date: July 25, 2023Reply Filed
Date: August 08, 2023Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: February 07, 2024Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 07, 2023Trial Setting Order filed
Date: August 16, 2023Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 25, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: June 30, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 23, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: May 03, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: May 03, 2021Answer Filed
Date: June 30, 2021Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: June 30, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 07, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: May 03, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 04, 2021Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: July 07, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 08, 2021Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Denied
Date: May 05, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: August 19, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 15, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: May 04, 2021Denied Fee Waiver Notice
Date: May 05, 2021Declaration re:
Date: October 21, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: October 28, 2021Motion re:
Date: October 21, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 28, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: October 28, 2021Amended Complaint Filed
Date: December 13, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: December 13, 2021Declaration re:
Date: January 10, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 03, 2022Motion to Strike
Date: January 10, 2022Demurrer Filed
Date: January 10, 2022Reply Filed
Date: February 22, 2022Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: February 17, 2022Proof of Service Filed
Date: February 17, 2022Reply Filed
Date: February 22, 2022Motion to Compel
Date: 2022-07-11T00:00:00Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2024 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Robinson, Jay H |
||
June 03, 2024 |
Department S37 - SBJC
Judge: Lee, Corey G |
||
June 03, 2024 |
Department S15 - SBJC
Judge: Lee, Corey G |
||
May 30, 2024 |
Department S35 - SBJC
Judge: Robinson, Jay H |
||
May 30, 2024 |
Department S37 - SBJC
Judge: Lee, Corey G |
||
May 30, 2024 |
Department S15 - SBJC
Judge: Lee, Corey G |
||
February 07, 2024 | Docket Event | Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent | |
September 25, 2023 |
Department S15 - SBJC
Judge: Lee, Corey G |
||
September 21, 2023 |
Department S15 - SBJC
Judge: Lee, Corey G |
||
August 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Trial Setting Order filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.