Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Admiral Insurance Company, filed a(n) Insurance Coverage - Insurance case represented by Walsh Mckean Furcolo Llp, against Does 1-10, Fusion Pacific, Inc., represented by Barba, Paul J, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with John M Tomberlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn M Tomberlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 06, 2021 |
CategoryInsurance Coverage Unlimited |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaInsurance |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeInsurance Coverage |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 06, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-04-06T00:00:00Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 06, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 29, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: April 29, 2021Declaration re:
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Demurrer Filed
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Motion to Stay
Date: 2021-06-04T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2021-07-06T00:00:00Declaration re:
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-07-13T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 13, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: July 15, 2021Declaration re:
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: July 15, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-07-15T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Reply Filed
Date: 2021-07-16T00:00:00Order Filed Re:
Date: July 28, 2021Declaration re:
Date: 2021-09-01T00:00:00Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: September 16, 2021Motion re:
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: September 16, 2021Declaration re:
Date: 2021-09-16T00:00:00Amended Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-11-05T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: November 05, 2021Supplemental Declaration Filed
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-11-19T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-11-22T00:00:00Proof of Service Filed
Date: November 23, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 23, 2021Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: December 01, 2021Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed
Date: January 19, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: January 28, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.