Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Guerra, Blanca, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Iarsusso Legal, against D & L Pizza, Inc. A California Corporation, Does 1 Through 100, Inclusive, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with John M Tomberlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn M Tomberlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryOther Employment Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: April 30, 2021Notice Sent re:
Date: April 30, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-04-09T00:00:00Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 30, 2021Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: June 24, 2021Notice Filed
Date: 2021-06-24T00:00:00Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: November 01, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: 2021-10-26T00:00:00Order Filed Re:
Date: November 01, 2021Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: November 08, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 04, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: February 03, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: March 03, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.