Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Marquez, Timothy M, Marquis Construction, Inc., filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Armenta Law, against Does 1 To 10, Higgins, Claudia Pilar, Higgins, Joshua, represented by Brown White & Osborn Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Brian S McCarville presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 09, 2021 |
CategoryFraud Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a proof of service of summons document in a legal case. It appears to be related to a civil case in the Superior Court of California, County of San Bernardino. The plaintiff/petitioner is Marquis Construction, Inc, et al., and the d...
Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 16, 2022Notice Filed
Date: July 27, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: April 09, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 09, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 09, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: April 30, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: April 30, 2021Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: July 02, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 07, 2021Motion re:
Date: July 09, 2021Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: July 02, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 04, 2021Reply Filed
Date: August 05, 2021Notice Filed
Date: July 27, 2022Notice Filed
Date: October 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 06, 2023 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Held Via Court Call | |
April 07, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Held Via Court Call | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Held Via Court Call | |
February 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Case is Re-Assigned for all Purposes to Department S30 |
|
October 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed Notice of Further Status Conference re: Status of Criminal Action and Further Trial Setting Conference filed by Plaintiff on 10.20.22 |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Remote Hearing Held Via Court Call | |
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Document Filed Response to Order to Show Cause |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Fax Received order to show cause |
|
August 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $4.00 VS paid on 1.27.23 for Fax Fees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.