Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Gomez, Umberto, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Law Offices Of Richard Kim, against 7-Eleven, Inc., Bhavnani, Dilip, Does 1 Through 50, Karma Dali Development, Llc, represented by Law Offices Of Anthony T Schneider, Law Offices Of Muhar Garber Av And Duncan, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Brian S McCarville presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrian S McCarville Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 06, 2021 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Order Filed Re:
Date: May 31, 2022Summary Judgment Filed
Date: September 12, 2022Notice of Entry of Judgment
Date: October 05, 2022Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: February 16, 2022Answer Filed
Date: September 14, 2021Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: August 23, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 06, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: September 14, 2021Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: September 14, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: April 06, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: March 03, 2022Answer Filed
Date: August 27, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: March 03, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: October 28, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: September 26, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: August 23, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: September 02, 2021Reply Filed
Date: May 18, 2022Motion - Summary Judgment
Date: March 03, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: April 06, 2021Proof of Sub-Service Filed. As to:
Date: August 23, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 28, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: May 10, 2022Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: October 06, 2022Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: September 15, 2021Declaration re:
Date: May 10, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 06, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 18, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: July 29, 2021Separate Statement Filed
Date: May 10, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 19, 2021Answer Filed
Date: July 29, 2021Notice of Association of Counsel for Defendant Filed
Date: September 14, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: December 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2023 | Hearing | Jury Trial Judicial Officer McCarville, Brian S Hearing Time 10:00 AM | |
October 23, 2023 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
October 19, 2023 | Hearing | Trial Readiness Conference Judicial Officer McCarville, Brian S Hearing Time 9:00 AM | |
October 19, 2023 |
Department S30 - SBJC
Judge: McCarville, Brian S |
||
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): A dismissal for all causes of action as to defendants Dilip Bhavnani and Karma Dali Development, LLC on 10/6/22 |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Dismissal Filed as to Defendant with prejudice filed by Plaintiff |
|
October 05, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment | |
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s): Cannot dismiss to entire action with an active judgment on the case. |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Summary Judgment Filed | |
September 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Comment: MSJ Judgment for 7-Eleven routed to S30 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.