Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Connect By American Family, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mendelson Schwarz, against Does 1-100, Webb, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Ronald J Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald J Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 07, 2021 |
CategoryUninsured Motorist $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedDecember 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Bernardino. The plaintiff, Connect by American Family, is seeking a subrogation claim and indebtedness against the defendant, Christopher Webb. T...
Declaration re: Reqst for Court Judgment under CCP585D Filed
Date: March 14, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: December 14, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: September 06, 2022Rqst for Entry of Dflt and Rqst for Clerk's/Court Jmt Filed
Date: March 14, 2022Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: April 07, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: April 07, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 07, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: May 06, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: May 06, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 27, 2021Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: March 14, 2022Signed Judgment Filed With Court
Date: May 31, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.