Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Delgadillo, Sandra Martinez, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Panish Shea Ravipudi Llp, Rm Law Group, against Cardenas Markets Llc, Cardenas Markets, Llc, Does 1 Through 50, represented by Dunbar & Associates, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Gilbert Ochoa presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGilbert Ochoa Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 30, 2021 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: February 26, 2024Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 19, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 07, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 28, 2024Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 28, 2024Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: May 25, 2021Stipulation Filed re:
Date: February 28, 2024Stipulation & Order filed
Date: October 27, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 22, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: October 06, 2021Notice
Date: March 09, 2023Answer Filed
Date: May 25, 2021Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 28, 2024Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: March 30, 2021Witness List Filed
Date: February 26, 2024Motion in Limine re:
Date: February 28, 2024Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: March 30, 2021Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: November 29, 2023Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: March 30, 2021Notice of Change of Firm Name Filed
Date: February 03, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 06, 2023Trial Setting Order filed
Date: January 19, 2024Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 06, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 10, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: October 22, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 22, 2021Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: October 26, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: March 30, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 02, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 03, 2024 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Raphael, Tony |
||
May 30, 2024 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
March 04, 2024 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Raphael, Tony |
||
March 04, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Copy of minute order dated 2/29/2024 |
|
February 29, 2024 |
Department R17 - Rancho Cucamonga
Judge: Ochoa, Gilbert |
||
February 29, 2024 |
Department S33 - SBJC
Judge: Keh, Winston |
||
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine re: (Pla) #4 to allow electronic presentation of opening statement |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Motion in Limine re: (Pla) # 3 expert opinions not disclosed at deposition |
|
February 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Stipulation Filed re: Stipulation of the parties |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.