Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Johnson, Crystal, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Commerce Law Group, against Ahmadinia, Mohammad R., Bolowich Do, Franz, Does 4 - 50, Lee M.D., Alexander, Reza Ahmadinia, M.D., Inc., (total of 6) See All represented by Thompson & Colegate, West & Rosa Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Thomas S Garza presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeThomas S Garza Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 21, 2021 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 18, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Declaration re:
Date: July 25, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: September 01, 2022Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed
Date: July 25, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: July 25, 2023Motion for Summary Judgment Filed
Date: May 26, 2023Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: September 20, 2022Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: May 26, 2023Declaration re:
Date: July 25, 2023Separate Statement Filed
Date: May 26, 2023Notice Filed
Date: July 25, 2023Answer Filed
Date: August 03, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Case Re-Assigned to Dept for all Purposes, Notice sent
Date: May 19, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 01, 2022Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk
Date: April 21, 2021Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: March 08, 2023Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: October 21, 2021Answer Filed
Date: April 05, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: October 14, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 21, 2021Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: January 18, 2022Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: October 12, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: March 01, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 28, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: April 21, 2021Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: January 18, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: January 18, 2022Answer Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: October 12, 2021Notice Sent re:
Date: April 21, 2021Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 06, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: October 21, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: July 28, 2021Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: January 12, 2022Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: April 21, 2021Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: October 12, 2021Notice
Date: July 25, 2023Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: April 21, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 28, 2022Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: March 08, 2023Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: February 14, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2024 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
May 09, 2024 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
October 18, 2023 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
October 02, 2023 |
Department S27 - SBJC
Judge: Garza, Thomas S |
||
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: of Sherlene Stepp, R.N. ISO DEF St. Mary Medical Center's Motion for Summary Judgment, or Alternatively, Summary Adjudication |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion re: Summary Judgment Filed or Alternatively, Summary Adjudication |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Separate Statement Filed of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, or Alternatively, Summary Adjudication |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration re: of Tuyet T. Tran ISO DEF St. Mary Medical Center's Motion for Summary Judgment, or Alternatively, Summary Adjudication |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of Lodging Medical Records ISO DEF St. Mary Medical Center's Motion fo4r Summary Judgment, or Alternatively, Summary Adjudication |
|
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice OF LODGING MEDICAL RECORDS IN SUPPT OF DEF. ST. MARY MEDICAL CENTER'S MSJ/A |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.