Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Guzman, Ignacio, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Law Office Of Robin E. Paley, A Plc, against Does 1-20, Samsung Electronics Home Appliances America, Llc, represented by Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Khymberli S Apaloo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKhymberli S Apaloo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 16, 2021 |
CategoryOther Non-Pi/Pd/Wd Tort Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-03-16T00:00:00Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: March 16, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: March 16, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: March 16, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: April 19, 2021On Court's Motion, Hearing Previously Set is Ordered Reset
Date: October 14, 2021Notice Filed
Date: November 29, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: January 20, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 24, 2022Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: January 20, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.