Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Velasquez, Hilario, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bd&J, Pc, against Does 1 To 20, Hong, Junmin, represented by Law Offices Of Anthony T Schneider, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with John M Tomberlin presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJohn M Tomberlin Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: February 26, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 26, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: February 26, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: March 25, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-02-26T00:00:00Proof of Substituted Service of Summons and Complaint
Date: 2021-04-15T00:00:00Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Answer Filed
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Consent to Eltronic Serv and Ntc of Eltronic Serv Add Filed
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 30, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: 2021-05-12T00:00:00Notice Filed
Date: 2021-08-03T00:00:00Case Management Conference Statement Filed
Date: 2021-08-10T00:00:00Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 17, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: August 13, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: August 26, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: August 26, 2021Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed
Date: December 06, 2021Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: October 05, 2021For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.