Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Diaz, Antonio, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Strategic Legal Practices, Apc, against Does 1 Through 10, Inclusive, Fca Us, Llc, Jeep Chrysler Dodge Ram Fiat Of Ontario, represented by Gordon Rees Scully Manuskhani, Llp, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Brian S McCarville presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 26, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedOctober 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
This complaint is filed by Antonio Diaz against FCA US, LLC; Jeep Chrysler Dodge Ram Fiat of Ontario; and Does 1 through 10. Antonio Diaz is a resident of San Bernardino County, California. FCA US, LLC is a corporation registered in Delaware and cond...
Dismissal as to Entire Action Filed
Date: May 26, 2022Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 26, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: February 26, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: February 26, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: February 26, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: February 26, 2021Answer Filed
Date: July 09, 2021Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: March 26, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 17, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: March 26, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: July 14, 2021Answer Filed
Date: July 09, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: July 14, 2021Declaration in Support of Motion re:
Date: July 14, 2021Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: July 14, 2021Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed
Date: July 14, 2021Request for Judicial Notice Filed
Date: August 25, 2021Motion to Compel Arbitration
Date: July 14, 2021Declaration re:
Date: August 25, 2021Reply to Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 31, 2021Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: August 25, 2021Dismissal Filed as to Defendant
Date: August 25, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: October 27, 2021Notice of Settlement of Entire Action Filed (Conditional)
Date: February 24, 2022Notice of Ruling Filed
Date: September 08, 2021Notice of Change of Address Filed
Date: January 25, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.