Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Elite Healthcare Staffing, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Anyiam Law Firm, against Adventist Health Facility, Broadway Health Center, Does 2-10, Elite Health Providers, Llc, represented by Law Offices Of Neil C Evans, Rostomyan Law Pc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Winston Keh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWinston Keh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 01, 2021 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 30, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Summons Issued and Filed
Date: February 01, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-02-01T00:00:00Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: February 01, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: February 01, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: February 10, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: May 05, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: May 17, 2021Amended Document Filed re:
Date: 2021-05-17T00:00:00Amendment to Complaint Naming Doe Filed
Date: June 16, 2021Request to Enter Default Filed
Date: 2021-07-07T00:00:00Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: July 15, 2021Motion to Set Aside Entry of Default
Date: 2021-07-22T00:00:00Order Filed Re:
Date: August 02, 2021Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before
Date: August 23, 2021Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: 2021-09-03T00:00:00Opposition to Motion Filed
Date: 2021-09-20T00:00:00Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: November 02, 2021Notice of Hearing
Date: 2021-11-04T00:00:00Amended Document Filed re:
Date: November 08, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: November 08, 2021Declaration Filed
Date: December 02, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: June 06, 2022Stipulation & Order filed
Date: January 25, 2023For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.