Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Velocity Investments, Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Mandarich Law Group, Llp, against Berry, Renee, Does 1-10, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts San Bernardino with Ronald J Gilbert presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRonald J Gilbert Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2021 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections $10,000 Or Less Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
Filing Court HouseSan Bernardino |
Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: January 05, 2021Declaration re:
Date: January 05, 2021Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: January 05, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: January 05, 2021Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: February 22, 2021Proof of Service Filed
Date: March 01, 2021General Denial Filed
Date: March 01, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: March 03, 2021Notice Filed
Date: November 23, 2021Proof of Service Unserved Filed. With Costs of:
Date: May 13, 2021Notice
Date: August 01, 2022Stipulation for Appointment of Court Commissioner filed
Date: August 03, 2022Order Filed Re:
Date: August 03, 2022Complaint Filed
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: 2021-01-05T00:00:00Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: 2021-02-05T00:00:00Order on Court Fee Waiver Filed - Granted by Clerk
Date: 2021-03-01T00:00:00Miscellaneous Document Filed
Date: August 01, 2022Dismissal Filed as to Does Only
Date: August 01, 2022Ex Parte Application
Date: August 01, 2022For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.