Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Hernandez, Jessica, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Matern Law Group, Pc, against Does 1 Through 50, Fueston, Jonathan, , Wal-Mart Associates, Inc., Walmart Inc., (total of 6) See All represented by Collinson, Daehnke, Inlow & Greco, Conley, James Taylor, Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc, in the jurisdiction of San Bernardino County. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts Superior with Jeffrey R Erickson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 23, 2020 |
CategoryWrongful Termination Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationSan Bernardino County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Filing Court HouseSuperior |
Notice Filed
Date: February 28, 2023Document is Returned by Court for the Following Reason(s):
Date: June 07, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: June 03, 2021Answer Filed
Date: July 06, 2021Stipulation Filed re:
Date: June 08, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 30, 2021Demand for Jury Trial Filed
Date: July 06, 2021Notice of Hearing Sent
Date: February 04, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 09, 2022Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: March 08, 2021Order Filed Re:
Date: June 14, 2021Complaint Filed
Date: December 23, 2020Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: May 06, 2021Summons Issued and Filed
Date: December 23, 2020Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: June 14, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 14, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 29, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 04, 2022Substitution of Attorney Filed
Date: April 05, 2022Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: December 02, 2021Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: November 15, 2022At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: February 01, 2023Order Filed Re:
Date: June 14, 2021Answer Filed
Date: March 30, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: February 15, 2023At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: January 31, 2023Notice Filed
Date: June 24, 2021Civil Case Cover Sheet Filed
Date: December 23, 2020Certificate of Assignment Received
Date: December 23, 2020Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: May 28, 2021Proof of Service of Summons and Comp/Pet Filed
Date: June 07, 2021Notice of Remote Appearance
Date: February 16, 2023Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: November 10, 2022Answer Filed
Date: May 16, 2022Amendment to Complaint Correcting Name Filed
Date: August 20, 2021Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:
Date: December 07, 2021Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed
Date: July 14, 2022At-Issue Memorandum Filed
Date: July 06, 2022Notice of Advanced Jury Fees Posted Filed
Date: May 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 04, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
February 29, 2024 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Filed of Court Ruling at February 16, 2023 Trial Setting Conference |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Remote Appearance | |
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Fax Received notice of remote apperance |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail: Trial Setting Orders |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Fee Paid by $4.00 CC pd fax fees |
|
February 16, 2023 |
Department S14 - SBJC
Judge: Erickson, Jeffrey R |
||
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed Filed by Jonathan Fueston on complaint on 02-15-23 |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Initial Trial Setting Conference Statement Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.